+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 15, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ90ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 021891796-H1
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 021891796-H1
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 021891796-H1
On February 10, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 022607796
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2002: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor