+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ896ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 034904890-E
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 034904890
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor