+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ891ER)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058542448
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058542448