+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ886ER)
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 099043592
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 099043592
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor