+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ883ER)
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 096866696
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 096866696
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor