+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (81-Y 17-N)
- Agreed to by House (81-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ88H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104572D-H1
- Taken up
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104572D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101949D
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (81-Y 17-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor