+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ88ER)
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 063663538
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/06 063663538
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor