+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 6, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ871ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 017793612-E
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 017793612
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor