+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ870ER)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 076692276
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 076692276
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor