+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ870ER)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 017708608-E
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 017708608