+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ87ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964507136-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964507136-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964507136-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 961871136-EH1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd. 961871136-EH1
- Amendment by Mr. Reynolds agreed to
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 961871136-H1
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 961871136-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 962254136