+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ858ER)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17103971D
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor