+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Taken up
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments by Delegate Marshall, R.G. rejected (31-Y 65-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 65-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (68-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (68-Y 26-N)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 11105219D
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 65-N)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (68-Y 26-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Rules (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor