+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ850ER)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 017686680-E
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 017686680