+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HJ85ER)
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ85ER)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senators: Norment, Stosch, Saslaw
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Delegates: Purkey, Orrock, Watts
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendments
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 97-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Taken up
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105147D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ85H1
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105147D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N)
- Reconsidered by Rules sub: Studies
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102420D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
March 1, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
February 27, 2012: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
February 7, 2012: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor