+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ849ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 036128890-E
- Engrossed by House
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 036128890
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor