+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ848ER)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 059181284
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 059181284
+ − Sponsors (120)
Type:
Primary Sponsor