+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ845ER)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19102173D