+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ844ER)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058430328
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058430328