+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ836ER)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- Received
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058355548
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058355548
+ − Vote
February 3, 2005: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (138)
Type:
Primary Sponsor