+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ836ER)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17100800D
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor