+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ834ER)
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 035881720-E
- Engrossed by House
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 035881720
+ − Sponsors (140)
Type:
Primary Sponsor