+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ825ER)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 096809696
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 096809696
+ − Sponsors (100)
Type:
Primary Sponsor