+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ824ER)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 996202198