+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ823ER)
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ823ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House(Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 992771204
- Consent to introduce