+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ817ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 7-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stolle, Norment, Quayle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Delegates: Reese, Griffith, Moran
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute
- Passed by temporarily
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 94-N)
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 050446484-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ817S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 050446484-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ817H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 050957484-H1
- Taken up
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 050957484-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 059899484
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N)
February 25, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor