+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ810ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Taken up
- Committee substitute agreed to 991117176-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 991117176-H1
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 991117176-H1
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 991563176
- Consent to introduce
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor