+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102299D
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor