+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ808ER)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11104596D
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11104596D
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor