+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ807ER)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 050931420
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 050931420
+ − Sponsors (139)
Type:
Primary Sponsor