+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ802ER)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 033667984-E
- Engrossed by House
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 033667984