+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ802ER)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058344344
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058344344
+ − Sponsors (138)
Type:
Primary Sponsor