+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ799ER)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15104542D
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor