+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ794ER)
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ794ER)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17100638D