+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ791ER)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 996036129
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor