+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 023735946
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor