+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ77ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106533D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ77H1
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106533D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104687D
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2018: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor