+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ765ER)
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058367508
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 058367508
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor