+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ761ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 013902732
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2001: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor