+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ761ER)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11103993D
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11103993D