+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ756ER)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 13100512D
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 13100512D
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor