+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ744ER)
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 12, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 010674608-E
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 010674608