+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ74ER)
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 044419412
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 044419412
- Prefiled; 01/08/04