+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ736ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 976037297
- Consent to introduce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor