+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ729ER)
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N)
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ729H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 072658284-H1
- Taken up
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 072658284-H1
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072649284