+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ727ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 036069964-E
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 036069964
+ − Vote
February 12, 2003: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor