+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ721ER)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Printed as engrossed 033694926-E
- Engrossed by House
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 033694926