+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ72ER)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12100397D
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/12 12100397D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor