+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House Block Vote (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 15103867D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor