+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 20, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ71ER)
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N)
- Agreed to by House (76-Y 21-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 6-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 18, 2000 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 005477820